Performance Contractors, Inc. v. Great Plains Stainless, Inc.

Plaintiff: Performance Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: Great Plains Stainless, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00485
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2013 134 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 114 Motion to Allow Testing. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/7/2013. (LLH)
July 12, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion in Limine; 69 Motion to Strike as provided herein; denying 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. The evidence and testimony of Performances experts excluded herein is stricken from the experts reports. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/11/2013. (LLH)
June 6, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 97 Great Plains Stainless, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Performance Contractors Inc.s Louisiana Products Liability Act and bad faith redhibition claims based on Great Plains status as a manufacturer are DISMISSED. Performance Contractors Inc. is granted leave to amend its pleadings to add a bad faith redhibition claim against Great Plains Stainless, Inc. as a seller. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 06/06/2013. (SMG)
November 5, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 37 Great Plains' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Great Plains' 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART, as Great Plains cannot be a manufacturer in regard to Performances claims or under the alter ego definition of manufacturer in the LPLA, and DENIED IN PART, as a genuine issue of material fact exists as to whether Great Plains is a manufacturer in regard to the claims Performance brings as Louisiana Chemical's assignee. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/2/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Performance Contractors, Inc. v. Great Plains Stainless, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Performance Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Andrishok
Represented By: Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson- B.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Plains Stainless, Inc.
Represented By: Virginia J. McLin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?