Joffrion v. Excel Maintainence Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Troy D. Joffrion
Defendant: Excel Maintainence Services, Inc. and Richard Miller, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00528
Filed: August 2, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; in that the plaintiff's claim arising under the Fair Labor Standards Act is DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED 43 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED.FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's remaining claims are REMANDED to the 18th Judicial District Court, Parish of West Baton Rouge, State of. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/27/2012. (LLH)
November 30, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 16 Motion to Compel Defendants to Complete Discovery as premature, procedurally deficient, and/or moot.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 11/30/2011. (CMM)
October 31, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 7 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Motion to Remand (entitled "Objection to Notice of Removal") is hereby denied. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/31/2011. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joffrion v. Excel Maintainence Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Maintainence Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sean T. McLaughlin
Represented By: David Mark Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Sean T. McLaughlin
Represented By: David Mark Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy D. Joffrion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?