White v. Moore

Plaintiff: Sarah Odaware White
Defendant: Unknown Moore and Warden Jim Rogers
Case Number: 3:2011cv00574
Filed: August 22, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment be DENIED, and that the defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment be GRANTED dismissing the plaintiff's claims asserted against the defendants, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 05/29/2013. (NLT)
April 13, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 20 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and the Court finds that the cross-motions by the parties for summary judgment are denied, and this matter is referred back to the MJ for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 4/12/2012. (JDL)
November 2, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to be Shipped to Bosier Max-Max. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 11/2/2011. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jim Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Odaware White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?