Smith v. Gagnard et al

Plaintiff: Earton Lynn Smith
Defendant: Grady Gagnard, Kewe Durpuis and John Doe # 1
Case Number: 3:2011cv00614
Filed: September 7, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 60 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, defts 58 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and this action shall be dismissed without prejudice to any state law claim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/23/2012. (JDL)
July 23, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 57 Report and Recommendations, 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Earton Lynn Smith iS DENIED 53 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Grady Gagnard, Bruce Dodd, Kenneth Washington, is GRANTED and the claims against defendants Capt. Grady Gagnard, Msgt. Kenneth Washington and Dy. Warden Bruce Dodd are dismissed. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/23/2012.(KDC) Modified on 7/23/2012 to correct text (KDC). Modified on 7/23/2012 (KDC).
April 30, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The partial motion to dismiss filed by Gagnard and Washington is granted insofar as defts seek dismissal of plaintiffs claims that he was issued a false disciplinary report and that the defendants violat ed DOC regulations, and the motion is denied otherwise. Plaintiffs claim that he was issued a false disciplinary report and that the department violated Department of Corrections regulations are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to any state law claim.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/30/2012. (PJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Gagnard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady Gagnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kewe Durpuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe # 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earton Lynn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?