Forever Green Athletic Fields, Inc. et al v. Babcock Law Firm, LLC et al

Plaintiff: David Ripka, Forever Green Athletic Fields, Inc. and Keith Day
Defendant: Stephen Babcock, APLC, Westport Insurance Corporation, Timothy Stephen Babcock, Babcock Law Firm, LLC and Babcock Partners, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00633
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 87 Motion for Summary Judgment due to peremption in favor of the defendants, and the case is DISMISSED. The other 99 , 104 , 106 and 107 motions for summary judgment are MOOT. Plaintiffs are ordered to pay costs totaling $3,735.50 within fifteen days of this ruling. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/10/2014. (LLH)
October 7, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 70 Motion to Dismiss and/or for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 10/7/2014. (LLH)
July 30, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 72 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs discovery responses shall be produced according to the instructions provided. Defendants are ORDERED to file an affidavit of reasonable expenses incurred in bringing this Motion, including attorney s fees, no later than 8/6/2014 and Plaintiffs may submit a response to Defendants affidavit within 7 days of its filing. Plaintiffs response shall be limited to the reasonableness of the amount of fees requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 7/30/2014. (LLH)
July 3, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 7/2/2014. (LLH)
January 3, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Compel. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Ruling on non-party attorney, Eric Ray Miller of the Kullman Firm, through the Courts electronic filing system. Additionally, Babcock shall provide non-party attorney, Eric Ray Miller of the Kullman Firm, with a copy of the Courts Ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 1/3/2014. (LLH)
November 12, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs shall obtain a copy of Document no. 130 from William Tolbosky and present it to the Court for an in-camera review no later than November 22, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 11/12/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forever Green Athletic Fields, Inc. et al v. Babcock Law Firm, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ripka
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forever Green Athletic Fields, Inc.
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Day
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Babcock, APLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westport Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Stephen Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babcock Law Firm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babcock Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?