Doe, XX v. Holy See (State of the Vatican City) et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: John Doe, XX
Defendant: Most Reverend Robert W Muench, Christopher Joseph Springer, The Redemptorists/New Orleans Vice Province, The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge, Holy See (State of the Vatican City) and Very Reverend, C.Ss. Harry Grile
Case Number: 3:2011cv00651
Filed: September 21, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/11/2012. (LLH) (Main Document 31 replaced on 9/12/2012) (NLT).
September 11, 2012 30 MOTION to Dismiss by John Doe, XX. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; ORDER)(Peavy, Felecia)
July 23, 2012 29 Featured Case ORDER...The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that the above action has been settled: IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/23/2012. (KDC)
July 2, 2012 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 26 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents MOTION for In Camera Inspection of DocumentsMOTION for Expedited Hearing filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Robert W Muench, The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge. (Pfister, C.)
June 13, 2012 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 26 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents MOTION for In Camera Hearing To Inspect DocumentsMOTION for Expedited Hearing. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JDL)
June 12, 2012 27 RESPONSE and Objection to 25 Joint MOTION to Quash Amended Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions and/or Subpoena for Records for the United States Conference of Catholic Bishops and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by John Doe, XX. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", # 3 Exhibit Exhibit "C")(Peavy, Felecia) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/14/2012 to correct page orientation) (DCB). Modified on 6/14/2012 to modify docket entry title to match pleading (DCB).
June 12, 2012 26 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, or in the Alternative, MOTION for In Camera Inspection of Documents and MOTION for Expedited Hearing for a by John Doe, XX. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit "A", # 3 Exhibit "B", # 4Exhibit "C", # 5 Exhibit "D")(Peavy, Felecia) (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/13/2012) (JDL). Modified on 6/13/2012 to correct document orientation and edit text (JDL). Modified on 6/21/2012 to edit text (JDL).
May 24, 2012 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 25 Joint MOTION to Quash Amended Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions and/or Subpoena for Records for the United States Conference of Catholic Bishops. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. Motion referred per district judge's chambers. (DCB)
May 22, 2012 25 Joint MOTION to Quash Amended Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions and/or Subpoena for Records for the United States Conference of Catholic Bishops by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Harry Grile, Robert W Muench, The Redemptorists/New Orleans Vice Province, The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading;, # 3 Exhibit)(Pfister, C.)
May 10, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on May 10, 2012. (SR)
May 7, 2012 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 23 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CMM)
May 4, 2012 23 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Robert W Muench, The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Protective Order)(Pfister, C.)
April 13, 2012 22 NOTICE: This case is reassigned from Magistrate Judge Christine A, Noland to Magistrate Judge Docia L. Dalby. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Christine Noland no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/13/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT ADI, )
April 2, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Joint MOTION to Quash Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions and Subpoena for Records for the United States Catholic Conference of Bishops without prejudice to the pltf to file a modified version.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 4/2/2012. (CMM)
April 2, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER denying 19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's 18 Response to Joint 17 Motion to Quash Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by The Redemptorists/New Orleans Vice Province, Robert W Muench, Harry Grile, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 4/2/2012. (CMM)
March 28, 2012 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Joint Motion to Quash Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions and Subpoena for Records for United States Catholic Conference of Bishops. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CMM)
March 28, 2012 19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's 18 Response to Joint 17 Motion to Quash Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions and Subpoena for Records for United States Catholic Conference of Bishops by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Harry Grile, Robert W Muench, The Redemptorists/New Orleans Vice Province, The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(Pfister, C.) Modified on 3/28/2012 to edit text. (CMM)
March 21, 2012 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to 17 Joint MOTION to Quash Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions and Subpoena for Records for the United States Catholic Conference of Bishops filed by John Doe, XX. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", # 3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Peavy, Felecia)
February 29, 2012 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 17 Joint MOTION to Quash Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions and Subpoena for Records for the United States Catholic Conference of Bishops. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JDL)
February 29, 2012 17 Joint MOTION to Quash Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions and Subpoena for Records for the United States Catholic Conference of Bishops by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Harry Grile, Robert W Muench, The Redemptorists/New Orleans Vice Province, The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Richard, Don)
January 24, 2012 16 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER... IT IS ORDERED that the scheduling conference set for 1/26/2012 is hereby CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established: Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2012. Filing all discovery motions and completing all discovery due by 10/1/2012. Expert Witness List due by 9/1/2012 for plaintiff and 10/1/2012 for defendant. Expert Reports due by 10/1/2012 for plaintiff and 11/1/2012 for defendant. Discovery from Experts due by 12/31/2012. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 1/31/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 1/24/2012. (LSM)
January 18, 2012 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT AMENDING STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Peavy, Felecia) Modified on 1/18/2012 to edit text. (CMM)
January 18, 2012 14 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Robert W Muench, The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge.(Pfister, C.)
January 16, 2012 13 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Harry Grile, The Redemptorists/New Orleans Vice Province.(Richard, Don)
January 12, 2012 12 STATUS REPORT by John Doe, XX. (Peavy, Felecia)
December 28, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fr. Harry Grile and The Redemptorists/New Orleans Vice Province answer due 1/16/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/28/2011. (JDL)
December 28, 2011 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JDL)
December 27, 2011 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Harry Grile, The Redemptorists/New Orleans Vice Province. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Richard, Don)
December 22, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 1 Complaint. Defendants, Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge, Most Reverend Robert W. Muench, his Predecessors and Successors, as Bishop of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge, and Firemans Fund Insurance Company, be and hereby is granted an extension of time up to and including January 18, 2012 within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs Original Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/22/2011. (LSM)
December 22, 2011 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1 Complaint,. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
December 21, 2011 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1 Complaint, by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Robert W Muench, The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;)(Pfister, C.)
December 2, 2011 7 Summons Issued as to Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (JDL)
November 30, 2011 6 Summons Submitted (Peavy, Felecia)
October 12, 2011 5 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2012 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Christine Noland. Status Report due by 1/12/2012.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 11/12/2011. (JRP)
September 28, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion for Felecia Yvonne Peavy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 9/28/2011. (LSM)
September 22, 2011 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 3 MOTION for Felecia Yvonne Peavy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $40.00, Receipt Number 053N-726160) MOTION for Felecia Yvonne Peavy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $40.00, Receipt Number 053N-726160). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (DCB)
September 21, 2011 3 MOTION for Felecia Yvonne Peavy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $40.00, Receipt Number 053N-726160) by John Doe, XX. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(LaPlace, Andre') (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/22/2011) (DCB). Modified on 9/22/2011 to correct page orientation (DCB).
September 21, 2011 2 Summons Issued as to Harry Grile, Holy See (State of the Vatican City), Robert W Muench, Christopher Joseph Springer, The Redemptorists/New Orleans Vice Province, The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT)
September 21, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053N-726086.), filed by John Doe, XX. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Attachment Summons, # 3 Attachment Summons, # 4 Attachment Summons, # 5 Attachment Summons, # 6 Attachment Summons, # 7 Attachment Summons, # 8 Proposed Pleading; Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit A)(LaPlace, Andre')

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe, XX v. Holy See (State of the Vatican City) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Most Reverend Robert W Muench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Joseph Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Redemptorists/New Orleans Vice Province
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holy See (State of the Vatican City)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Very Reverend, C.Ss. Harry Grile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe, XX
Represented By: Andre' Phillip LaPlace
Represented By: Felecia Y. Peavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?