Central Facilities Operating Company, L.L.C. v. Cinemark U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Central Facilities Operating Company, L.L.C. |
Defendant: |
Perkins Rowe Associates, L.L.C.,, Perkins Rowe Block A Condominiums, L.L.C., Perkins Rowe Associates II, L.L.C., Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. and Cinemark U.S.A., Inc. |
ThirdParty Defendant: |
Perkins Rowe Associates II, L.L.C. and Joseph T Spinosa |
Unknown: |
C. Kevin Kobbe |
ThirdParty Plaintiff: |
Cinemark U.S.A., Inc. |
Counter Defendant: |
Central Facilities Operating Company, L.L.C. |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv00660 |
Filed: |
September 26, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Baton Rouge Office |
Presiding Judge: |
James J. Brady |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen C. Riedlinger |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Jobs |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 4, 2014 |
Filing
216
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/4/2014. (NLT)
|
August 6, 2014 |
Filing
206
RULING: CFOC is entitled to recover the full amount owed for its provision of chilled water services to Cinemarks Theatre plus interest as provided for by law. Pursuant to the terms of the Theatre Lease, Cinemark is entitled to attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses incurred during the pursuit of its breach of contract claim against Perkins Rowe. CFOC shall file a proposed judgment in conformity herewith after attaining approval as to form from Cinemark and Perkins Rowe withi n 14 days of the date of this ruling. Cinemark shall file the proper motion and accompanying documentation demonstrating the precise amount of attorneys fees requested within 45 days of the date of this ruling. Perkins Rowe shall file any opposition within 21 days of the date of Cinemarks motion. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 08/06/2014. (CGP)
|
July 23, 2013 |
Filing
136
RULING denying 108 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 110 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/23/2013. (NLT)
|
April 3, 2012 |
Filing
53
RULING Adopting 52 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge as to the 30 Motion to Remand filed by Central Facilities Operating Company, L.L.C. The plaintiff's Motion for Remand to State Court is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/3/2012. (LSM)
|
February 7, 2012 |
Filing
42
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/6/2012. (JDL)
|
February 6, 2012 |
Filing
39
RULING granting in part and denying in part, as stated, 29 Sealed Motion for Protective Order and Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Memorandum and Certain Exhibits in Support of Its Motion for Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/3/2012. (JDL)
|
February 3, 2012 |
Filing
38
Ruling as to 32 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines; 32 Motion to Stay. Accordingly, the plaintiffs motion is granted insofar as the plaintiff sought an extension of time until March 14, 2012 to serve its responses to defendant Cinemark USAs discovery requests. In all other respects, the plaintiffs motion is denied.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/3/2012. (LSM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Central Facilities Operating Company, L.L.C. v. Cinemark U.S.A., Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Perkins Rowe Associates, L.L.C., |
Represented By: |
Stephen I. Dwyer |
Represented By: |
Robert William Knights |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Perkins Rowe Block A Condominiums, L.L.C. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Perkins Rowe Associates II, L.L.C. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Stephen C. Carleton |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Cinemark U.S.A., Inc. |
Represented By: |
Lawrence E. Abbott |
Represented By: |
Gregory P. Aycock |
Represented By: |
Rachelle D. Dick |
Represented By: |
Byron D. Kitchens |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty defendant: Perkins Rowe Associates II, L.L.C. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty defendant: Joseph T Spinosa |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Unknown: C. Kevin Kobbe |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty plaintiff: Cinemark U.S.A., Inc. |
Represented By: |
Lawrence E. Abbott |
Represented By: |
Gregory P. Aycock |
Represented By: |
Rachelle D. Dick |
Represented By: |
Byron D. Kitchens |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter defendant: Central Facilities Operating Company, L.L.C. |
Represented By: |
Thomas E. Balhoff |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Central Facilities Operating Company, L.L.C. |
Represented By: |
Thomas E. Balhoff |
Represented By: |
Judith R. E. Atkinson |
Represented By: |
Roedel, Parsons, Koch, Blache, Balhoff & McCollister |
Represented By: |
Luke F. Piontek |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?