Deal v. State of Louisiana

Plaintiff: Paul B Deal
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2011cv00743
Filed: November 2, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Original and Supplemental Reports of Plaintiffs Expert Dan Cliffe (R.Doc. 67) filed by the Defendant State of Louisiana, through Department of Justice, Office of Attorney General is DENIED; and FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant shall have until one (1) week before trial, or until November 10, 2014, to re-take the deposition of Plaintiffs expert Dan Cliffe. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/21/2014. (JDL)
August 28, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/28/2013. (LLH)
July 8, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part as to the disparate impact claim and denying in part as to the disparate treatment claim 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/8/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deal v. State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul B Deal
Represented By: Crystal LaFleur
Represented By: Jill L. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Amy L. McInnis
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?