Hill v. Kilbourne et al

Plaintiff: Marcus D. Hill
Defendant: John Doe and Tyrone Kilbourne
Case Number: 3:2011cv00778
Filed: November 15, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2015 124 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 110 Motion in Limine. The 104 , 111 and 112 Motions in Limine are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's 120 Objection to Defendant's Proposed Charges/Instructions/Verdict Form is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 3/13/2015. (SMG)
June 23, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 22 and 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. The claims against the misnamed Defendant, Capt. Jerry Babin, are dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P., for failure to serve. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 06/23/2014. (CGP)
June 4, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Deft Tyrone Kilbourne's 23 Motion to Submit Documents under Seal for In Camera Inspection is denied. However, the exhibits shall remain under seal until the time for the deft to appeal this ruling to the district judge has expired. I f this ruling is not timely appealed to the district judge, the exhibits will be unsealed and the deft will be required to provide copies of them to the pltf. Alternatively, the deft may move to withdraw the exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 6/4/2012. (JDL)
March 30, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Identification of John Doe 1, 2 and 3 to identify Col. John Smith, Maj. Doug Stroughter and Capt. Jerry Babin as the 3 defts. In all other respects, the motion is denied. IT IS ORDERED that defts Col. John Smith, Maj. Doug Stroughter and Capt. Jerry Babin be served with the amended complaint (7) in accordance with law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/30/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Kilbourne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone Kilbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus D. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?