Fabre v. Mega Transportation Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bobby Fabre
Defendant: Royal Freight, LP and Mega Transportation Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00800
Filed: November 23, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 137 Motion to Take Judicial Notice of Plaintiffs Average Life Expectancy. The Clerk of Court's officer shall terminate document 138 as it is now moot. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/14/2014. (SMG)
March 7, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 124 Motion in Limine. The Clerk of Courts office shall terminate Document 122 and Document 123, as they are duplicative of Document 124. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 03/07/2014. (CGP) Modified on 3/7/2014 to edit text(CGP).
July 23, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/23/2013. (SMG)
June 19, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 89 Motion for Certification of Order for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 06/17/2013. (SMG)
April 12, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 68 Defts Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Marius Ziejewiski. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/10/2013. (JDL)
March 5, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 7 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 7 Motion to Name Bennie Wilder as an Indespensible Party and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/2/2012. (LSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fabre v. Mega Transportation Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Freight, LP
Represented By: Charles J. Duhe, Jr.
Represented By: Marvin Huber Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mega Transportation Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles J. Duhe, Jr.
Represented By: Marvin Huber Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Fabre
Represented By: Waldon Michael Hingle
Represented By: Donald George D'Aunoy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?