Nassri et al v. Inland Dredging Company

Plaintiff: James Morris and Fayez Nassri
Defendant: Inland Dredging Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv00853
Filed: December 28, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART 102 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Dr. Curtis Partington filed on behalf of defendant Inland Dredging Company. Signed by Judge Stanwood Duval, Jr on 1/23/2013. (swd)
January 16, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 96 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment-Exoneration From and/or Limitation of Liability.Signed by Judge Stanwood Duval, Jr on 1/16/2013. (MM)
January 15, 2013 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 85 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Presumption of Negligence. Signed by Judge Stanwood Duval, Jr on 1/15/2013. (swd)
December 17, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 63 Motion for Reconsideration on Judge's Ruling Concerning Vessel Status Ruling. (GEC)
November 6, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION GRANTING 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant; DENYING 19 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs'. Signed by Judge Stanwood Duval, Jr on 11/6/2012. (swd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nassri et al v. Inland Dredging Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inland Dredging Company
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Ashley E. Boyd
Represented By: Corey P Parenton
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Morris
Represented By: Peyton Patrick Murphy
Represented By: Denise Ann Vinet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fayez Nassri
Represented By: Peyton Patrick Murphy
Represented By: Denise Ann Vinet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?