Wagster et al v. Gautreaux et al

Plaintiff: Jason Wagster and Elena Aucoin
Defendant: Certain Other Unknown Officers, Sheriff Sidney J. Gautreaux, III, Melvin L. Holden and Darryl Michelli
Case Number: 3:2012cv00011
Filed: January 6, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and RULING granting 60 Motion to Dismiss for subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1). Plaintiffs' Federal Tort Claims Act allegations against Defendant Moore shall be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/16/2014. (SMG)
February 4, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND RULING granting 55 Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), and Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Flausse in his official capacity shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 2/4/2014. (LLH)
January 6, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND RULING granting 53 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court's Ruling of 11/26/2013 is hereby AMENDED and Plaintiffs' remaining claims against Defendant Nathan Harrison arising out of the 1/7/2011 incident are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/6/2014. (LLH)
November 26, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/26/2013. (LLH)
October 7, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Dismiss for failure of Plaintiff's to effectuate service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 4(m). Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Dave Flausse in his individual capacity are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Dave Flausse in his official capacity are still pending. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/7/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagster et al v. Gautreaux et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Other Unknown Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Sidney J. Gautreaux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin L. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Michelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Wagster
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Aucoin
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?