Welch v. Cain et al

Petitioner: Glen Welch
Respondent: N. Burl Cain and James Caldwell
Case Number: 3:2012cv00038
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 34 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The petitioner's application for habeas corpus relief is DISMISSED. Further, in the event the petitioner seeks to pursue an appeal in this case, a certificate of appealability is DENIED for the reasons set forth in the report. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/2/2015. (BCL)
November 26, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 29 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 18 Motion to Dismiss filed by James Caldwell is DENIED AS MOOT and this matter is referred back to the MJ for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/26/2012. (JDL)
May 30, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 13 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge, petitioner's application for habeas corpus is timely and the State is directed to file a supplemental memorandum within 21 days, addressing petitioner's claims. Further, State shall supplement the record with those portions of the state court record necessary for a full and complete review of the petitioner's substantive claims. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/30/2012. (SWE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Glen Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?