Moore v. Boeker et al

Plaintiff: Johnny Moore
Defendant: Barrett L. Boeker, Tim Delaney and Jonathan Roundtree
Case Number: 3:2012cv00051
Filed: January 26, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2015 98 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER Regarding 94 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis on Appel, filed by Johnny Moore. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 9/14/2015. (LLH)
September 18, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion Adopting the 58 Supplemental Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 50 Motion for Summary Judgment be denied, and this matter be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. The 53 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge is hereby found moot. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 9/18/2014. (LLH)
July 9, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 27 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge.The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs state law claims. The defendants 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part, dismissi ng the Plaintiff's claims asserted against Defendants Tim Delaney and Jonathan Roundtree, with prejudice, and dismissing all of the Plaintiff's claims asserted against Defendant Barrett L. Boeker except the Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim of excessive force asserted against Defendant, Boeker in the defendants individual capacity. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/09/2013. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Boeker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett L. Boeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?