SJB Group, LLC et al v. TBE Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: SJB Group, LLC and Catlin Insurance Co., Inc.
Defendant: TBE Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00181
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/26/13. (DCB)
September 23, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 85 Motion for Partial Reconsideration of 74 Order on Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/23/2013. (SMG)
August 21, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 29 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Tom Iseley, Ph.D., P.E. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 08/21/2013. (CGP)
August 19, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 32 Plaintiff's Daubert Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Louis G. Fey, Jr. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 08/19/2013. (CGP)
August 13, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Testimony. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 08/12/2013. (CGP)
June 13, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Compel. If not already done, Plaintiff Catlin shall make available a corporate representative to testify on its behalf as to the matters for examination identified in the March notice for deposition. All other grounds for the motion to compel are denied. Each party shall bear its own costs incurred in connection with this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 6/13/2013. (LLH)
April 25, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1653, that, on or before 5/10/2012, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing its citizenship, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 4/24/2012. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SJB Group, LLC et al v. TBE Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJB Group, LLC
Represented By: LaToya D Jordan
Represented By: Adrian G. Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catlin Insurance Co., Inc.
Represented By: LaToya D Jordan
Represented By: Adrian G. Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBE Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?