Couvillion v. Reddy Ice Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Sylvia Brown Couvillion
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Reddy Ice Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00204
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 42 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/22/2014. (SMG)
May 14, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 30 and 32 Motions for Summary Judgment. The 37 Motion to Strike Affidavit is also DENIED. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 5/14/2014. (SMG)
July 12, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Modify ERISA Case Order to Permit Limited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 07/11/2013. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Couvillion v. Reddy Ice Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Brown Couvillion
Represented By: Charles A. Schutte, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reddy Ice Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?