Perritt et al v. Westlake Vinyls Co., LP et al

Plaintiff: Hersey James, Barry Mitchell, Blake Perritt, Ronnie Sellers, Rubin Crayton, Jr., Dezmon Ellzey, Mauricio Bendeck and Steven Burns
Defendant: Westlake Chemical Corporation and Westlake Vinyls Co., LP
Plaintiff- Consolidated: Shanice Hills, Frederick Hollins and Laura Hollins
Case Number: 3:2012cv00253
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER Adopting the 87 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 77 Motion to Remand is GRANTED and 3:13-cv-209 is REMANDED to the 23rd Judicial District Court, Ascension Parish, State of Louisiana. The Clerk of Court shall enter this Order in the docket for the lead case in the matter (3:12-cv-253), and in the case specific docket for civil action 3:13-cv-209. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/18/2014. (LLH)
May 15, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re civil action 13-269, defendants Westlake Chemical Corporation and Westlake Vinyls Company, LP and plaintiff Freddie Jackson shall submit briefs or other appropriate filings no later than 6/5/2014, addressing whether the amount in controversy requirement for diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a) is satisfied for this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 5/14/2014. (LLH)
March 11, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER adopting the 9 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and granting 6 Motion to Remand. Civil Case 13-253(Linda Martin, et al v. Westlake vinyls Compalny LP, et al) is Remanded to the 23rd JDC, Ascension Parish, State of Louisiana. ( A Certified copy of this order sent to 23rd JDC.) The Clerk of Court shall enter this Order in the docket for the lead case (3:12-253) and in the case-specific docket for civil action 3:13-253. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/10/2014(LLH)
March 5, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER. The Court APPROVES the Magistrate Judges REPORT 55 and the recommendation contained therein, and ADOPTS it as the Court's opinion. Accordingly, for reasons explained in the Magistrate Judge's Report 55 , IT IS ORDERED that the claims of the plaintiff, Anthony Jones, 3:13cv00270 are DISMISSED pursuant to FRCP 41(b) and Local Rule 41.2, for failure to prosecute. For good cause, Plaintiff may request reinstatement of his action within 30 days. The Clerk of Court shall enter this Order in the docket for the lead case in this matter (12cv00253), and in the case-specfic docket for civil action 13cv00270. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/5/2014. (PJH)
December 9, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 and 8 Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to appropriate judicial district court). Civil actions 3:12-cv-253 and 3:12-254 are each REMANDED to the 23rd Judicial District Court, Ascension Parish, State of Louisiana. Westlake's 7 Motion Requesting Oral Argument is DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall enter this Order in both the lead case(3:12-cv-253) and civil action 3:12-cv-254. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/9/2013. (LLH)
February 26, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 8 Motion to Remand and denying defendants 7 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/26/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perritt et al v. Westlake Vinyls Co., LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff- consolidated: Shanice Hills
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff- consolidated: Frederick Hollins
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff- consolidated: Laura Hollins
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hersey James
Represented By: Marvin Gros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Mitchell
Represented By: Marvin Gros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Perritt
Represented By: Marvin Gros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Sellers
Represented By: Marvin Gros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubin Crayton, Jr.
Represented By: Marvin Gros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dezmon Ellzey
Represented By: Marvin Gros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Bendeck
Represented By: Marvin Gros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Burns
Represented By: Marvin Gros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Ernest L. Edwards, Jr.
Represented By: B. Richard Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Pastorek
Represented By: Hal Clayton Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Vinyls Co., LP
Represented By: Ernest L. Edwards, Jr.
Represented By: B. Richard Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Pastorek
Represented By: Hal Clayton Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?