Cook v. Perkins et al

Plaintiff: Stephen P. Cook
Defendant: Willie Graves and Denny Perkins
Case Number: 3:2012cv00258
Filed: April 30, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 39 Plaintiffs Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/7/2014. (JDL)
January 6, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 64 Motion for Judgment in Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/6/2014. (JDL)
October 21, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/21/2013. (NLT)
October 10, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part 27 Motion to Strike Exhibits From Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment. The motion is granted as to Exhibit B-2. The motion is denied as to Exhibits A-1, A-2, and C-1. The motion is also denied as to Exhibit A-3, to the extent the state court pleadings submitted contain facts that are not hearsay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/9/2013. (NLT)
September 24, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING regarding 17 Motion for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Former Sheriff Willie Graves and Sheriff Jason Ard: The motion is granted in part, dismissing the plaintiffs claims brought under 42 U.S.C. §1983 and all state law claims against defendant Sheriff Ard, except for the state law vicarious liability claim. As to this state law claim the motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/24/2013. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Perkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen P. Cook
Represented By: Philip J. Shaheen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Graves
Represented By: Cullen J. Dupuy
Represented By: Druit George Gremillion, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denny Perkins
Represented By: Cullen J. Dupuy
Represented By: Druit George Gremillion, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?