Poullard v. McCoy et al

Plaintiff: John Poullard
Defendant: Donald Barr, Burl Cain, Anthony McCoy, Kisha McMillian, Johnathan Roundtree and Christine Washington
Case Number: 3:2012cv00299
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2016 278 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court DENIES 249 Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial, 250 Motion to Vacate Judgment and, to the extent that it constitutes a separate motion, Plaintiff's Supplement to Plaintiff's 271 Motion for New Trial and 274 Motion for Subpoena Induces Tecum on Motion for New Trial Base on New Discover Evidence. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 02/01/2016. (NLT)
June 13, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 131 Motion in Limine and Motion to Strike without prejudice to the plaintiff objecting to the introduction of medical records at the trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 6/13/2014. (SMG)
April 28, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 117 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction Motion 103 for Injunction and a Federal Consent Decree is DENIED. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 04/28/2014. (CGP) Modified on 4/28/2014 to edit text (CGP).
March 17, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 109 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge; denying 91 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Burl Cain, Donald Barr, 92 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Johnathan Roundtree, 97 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John Poullard; 99 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John Poullard,. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 03/17/2014. (CGP)
August 5, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 74 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/5/2013. (SMG)
October 30, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 18 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiffs claims which arose prior to November 2010 against EMT Anthony Mccoy, nurse Kisha McMillian and nurse Christine Washington are dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/30/2012. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poullard v. McCoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kisha McMillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Poullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?