Cox v. Columbia Casualty Company et al

Plaintiff: John Paul Cox
Defendant: Joel Arnold, Columbia Casualty Company and Willie Graves
Case Number: 3:2012cv00306
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion in Limine for reasons assigned. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/16/15. (Dick, Shelly)
October 28, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court finds that bifurcation under Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is warranted and in the interests of justice and judicial economy to reduce the risk of prejudice and confusion. Defendants 53 and 56 Motions for Se parate Trial are GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Arnold will be tried first. If the jury finds that any of Plaintiffs constitutional rights have been violated or state law intentional torts have been committed against Plaintiff, the tria l will proceed before the same jury with respect to the liability of the municipal Defendants. Plaintiffs 61 Motion to Strike Defense is DENIED. A separate notice will be issued setting this trial for 3/23/2015 through 4/2/2015, with the claims against Defendant Arnold to be decided first in accordance with this opinion. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/28/2014. (SMG)
January 3, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 21 and 22 Defendants' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/3/2014. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Columbia Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul Cox
Represented By: Kearney S. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?