Sandifer et al v. Hoyt Archery, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Amanda Sandifer, Mary Sandifer and Ryan Sandifer
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company and Hoyt Archery, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00322
Filed: June 1, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2015 176 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 158 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/28/2015. (BCL)
July 20, 2015 164 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Defendant's 104 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Any Alleged Prior Similar Incidents is DENIED. Plaintiff's 110 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Mark L. Edwards Ph.D. is DENIED. Defendant's 106 Daubert Challenge an d Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Stephen A. Batzer is DENIED. Defendant's 108 Daubert Challenge and Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Gautam Ray is DENIED. Plaintiffs' 112 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Gideon Jolley is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. Plaintiffs' 114 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Alfred Bowles is DENIED. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/20/2015. (BCL)
June 1, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: The 97 Motion to Quash is GRANTED to the extent Defendants seek investigative materials compiled by Mr. Ragsdale in relation to the Feddersen Incident and DENIED to the extent it seeks sanctions against Defendants. Each party will bear their own costs with respect to the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 06/01/2015. (BCL)
July 17, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 59 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 7/17/2014. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandifer et al v. Hoyt Archery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyt Archery, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Eiselen
Represented By: Michael P. Mentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Sandifer
Represented By: John W. deGravelles
Represented By: John Neale deGravelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sandifer
Represented By: John W. deGravelles
Represented By: John Neale deGravelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Sandifer
Represented By: John W. deGravelles
Represented By: John Neale deGravelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?