Gordon et al v. Air Liquide- Big Three Inc et al

Plaintiff: Carolyn Gordon, Venita Walker, Jeffery Domingue and Juenell Domingue
Defendant: Air Liquide-Big Three, Inc., Air Liquide Specialty Gases, LLC and Air Liquide America LP
Case Number: 3:2012cv00396
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Dismiss or Alternative Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/30/2014. (SMG)
February 18, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 40 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand is denied. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 2/18/2014. (SMG)
July 10, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 13 Report and Recommendations; denying 8 Motion to Remand filed by Jeffery Domingue, Venita Walker, Carolyn Gordon, Juenell Domingue. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/10/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon et al v. Air Liquide- Big Three Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Gordon
Represented By: Steven Alfred Adams
Represented By: Ricardo A. Caballero
Represented By: Cleo Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venita Walker
Represented By: Steven Alfred Adams
Represented By: Ricardo A. Caballero
Represented By: Cleo Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Domingue
Represented By: Steven Alfred Adams
Represented By: Ricardo A. Caballero
Represented By: Cleo Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juenell Domingue
Represented By: Steven Alfred Adams
Represented By: Ricardo A. Caballero
Represented By: Cleo Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Liquide-Big Three, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn Michael Farnet
Represented By: Kean Miller LLP
Represented By: David K. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Liquide Specialty Gases, LLC
Represented By: Glenn Michael Farnet
Represented By: Kean Miller LLP
Represented By: David K. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Liquide America LP
Represented By: David K. Nelson
Represented By: Kean Miller LLP
Represented By: Glenn Michael Farnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?