Butler v. State of Louisiana, Louisiana Department of Safety and Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Scott J. Butler
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Louisiana Department of Safety and Corrections and Captain Tom Madden
Notice Only: Pamela R Jones
Case Number: 3:2012cv00420
Filed: July 13, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: The Defendants' 66 Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. James C. Patterson and Theresa Steward is DENIED. Defendants' 86 Motion in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Statements is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's 85 Motion in Limine to Restrict Testimony is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/16/2014. (SMG)
December 4, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Plaintiff's 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is also DENIED. Defendants' 67 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/3/2014. (JDL)
August 6, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Compel non-party, Matrix, Inc. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is GRANTED as to the 10/17/2011 Memorandum that was provided to Matrix by the Defendant. Matrix is ORDERED to produce the M emo to Plaintiff within 7 days of this Order. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel is DENIED as to the withheld e-mail communications between Defendants counsel and agents of Matrix. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 08/06/2014. (CGP) Modified on 8/6/2014 to edit text (CGP).
July 25, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Any opposition by Matrix, Inc., to Plaintiffs 51 Motion to Compel, must be filed by 8/1/2014. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Ruling on non-party, Matrix, Inc., through the Courts electronic filing system. Plaintiff shall provide non-party, Matrix, Inc., with a copy of the Courts Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 7/25/2014. (SMG)
July 18, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 51 MOTION to Compel Matrix, Incorporated to Produce Documents Responsive to Subpoenas. Plaintiff shall serve Matrix, Inc. with a copy of the Motion to Compel no later than 7/23/2014 and file proof of service with the Court no later than 7/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 7/17/2014. (LLH)
May 29, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons given, IT IS ORDERED that defendants' Motion to Compel [rec. doc. 11] is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 5/29/2013. (JSL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. State of Louisiana, Louisiana Department of Safety and Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Louisiana Department of Safety and Corrections
Represented By: Rachelle D. Dick
Represented By: Amy E. Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Tom Madden
Represented By: Amy E. Newsom
Represented By: Rachelle D. Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: Pamela R Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?