Dragna et al v. A & Z Transportation, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Larry S. Dragna and Trish L Dragna
Defendant: A & Z Transportation, Inc., Roble Abdll and Great West Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv00449
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2015 122 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The 55 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Joint Venture Theory is GRANTED. The 56 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. The 57 Defendant's Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 02/19/2015. (BCL)
November 7, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 53 Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Thomas M. Corsi, Ph.D and 54 Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defense Expert Lane S. Vaningen. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/6/2014. (LLH)
October 30, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 51 Motion in Limine and evidence, testimony and argument pertaining to the Carrier Certification Sheet shall be excluded at the trial of this matter. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/30/2014. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dragna et al v. A & Z Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & Z Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley J. Luminais, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roble Abdll
Represented By: Bradley J. Luminais, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Brittany Courtenay
Represented By: Bradley J. Luminais, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry S. Dragna
Represented By: Cody Michael Martin
Represented By: Percy, Stromberg, Bush & Lanoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trish L Dragna
Represented By: Cody Michael Martin
Represented By: Percy, Stromberg, Bush & Lanoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?