Williams v. Sanders et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Williams
Defendant: John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Joshua Francois and John Sanders
Case Number: 3:2012cv00475
Filed: August 7, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 61 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 9/14/2015. (LLH)
July 21, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER as to 68 Request for Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Fact filed by Ronald Williams. Plaintiff's Exhibit 3 (Product Literature for Sabre Red Chemical Spray) shall be admitted into evidence. See Defendant's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents (Docs. 23 & 23-1); Suit No. USM-11-677 Docs. 70 and 71, paragraph 6. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/21/2015. (LLH) Modified on 7/21/2015 to edit text (LLH).
January 6, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING adopting 39 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 37 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in connection with the Plaintiff's claim that Defendants Sanders and Morris utilized excessive force against him. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/6/2014. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?