Dominick v. Barrere et al

Plaintiff: Donald Dominick
Defendant: Todd Barrere, Unknown Camp, Unknown Clark, Patrick Cochran and Unknown White
Case Number: 3:2012cv00497
Filed: August 15, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2015 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 168 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal and denying 169 Motion to Make Judgment Executory and Examine Judgment Debtor. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/1/2015. (BCL)
June 23, 2015 163 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 154 MOTION for New Trial and Alternative Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/23/2015. (LLH)
March 5, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 59 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Witnesses Roland Lewis, Daniel Bellard, and Kennedy Jackson; and granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion in Limine to Exclude Enumerated Plaintiff's Exhibit Lists, so that the affidavits of Adrian Almadovar, LaShawnda Horne, Frank Johnson,and Jonathan Roundtree are inadmissible. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 02/28/2014. (CGP)
January 21, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Captain Todd Barrere, Lieutenant Richard Camp, and Lieutenant Patrick Cochran; denying 31 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Sergeant Craig White. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 01/21/2014. (CGP)
January 13, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 40 Motion in Limine Regarding Comparative Fault, denying 41 Motion in Limine to Suppress Testimony and Evidence Regarding Inmate Witnesses, and granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion in Limine to Suppress Testimony and Evidence, such that the disciplinary reports of 1/8/2012, authored by defendants Todd Barrere and W. Clark, are excluded as an exhibit at trial. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/13/2014. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominick v. Barrere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Barrere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dominick
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?