Angeletti et al v. Lane et al

Plaintiff: Marc DiLeo, Ubiel Gonzalez, Byron Hall, Tonya Harmason, Timothy James, Shawntel Johnson, Justin Offord, Dwayne Postell, Brian Thompson, Eric Angeletti and Terry Bell
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Gerry Lane Buick-Pontiac-GMC, LLC, Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc and Gerald Lane
Case Number: 3:2012cv00503
Filed: August 17, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 85 and 90 Motions in Limine and granting 89 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/9/2014. (SMG)
September 19, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Angeletti's federal and state law discrimination claims against Gerald R. Lane, or any othe r individual supervisor or fellow employee, is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Angeletti's claim that he was subjected to a hostile work environment claim on the basis of his sex is GRANTED. Defendants' request th at the Court dismiss Angeletti's claim under La. R.S. § 23:631 is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Angeletti's hostile work environment claim on the basis of his national origin is DENIED. Defendants' req uest that the Court dismiss Angeletti's hostile work environment claim on the basis of his race is DENIED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Angeletti's retaliation claim is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court d ismiss Angeletti's constructive discharge claim is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Angeletti's assault claim is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Angeletti's battery claim is DENIED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Angeletti's intentional infliction of emotional distress claim is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/19/2014. (NLT)
September 4, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/4/2014. (LLH)
August 28, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 16 Motion to Consolidate Cases, without prejudice to Angeletti's right to refile the motion once discovery is complete and the Court has ruled on any impending dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/27/2013. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angeletti et al v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Lane Buick-Pontiac-GMC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc DiLeo
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ubiel Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Hall
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Harmason
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy James
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawntel Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Offord
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Postell
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Thompson
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Angeletti
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Bell
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?