Fernandez v. Tamko Building Products Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Jorge Fernandez
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company and Tamko Building Products Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2012cv00518
Filed: August 23, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 115 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs construction/composition defect claim, is hereby GRANTED. The trial set for 05/05/ 2014, is hereby cancelled. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 04/11/2014. (CGP) Modified on 4/11/2014 to edit text (CGP).
March 7, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 03/07/2014. (CGP)
September 16, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 31 Motion to Compel Defendants 30(b)(6) Corporate Deposition and for Sanctions, Attorney Fees, and Costs is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/16/2013. Modified on 9/16/2013to edit text (LLH).
July 15, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court REASONS AND ORDER granting 30 Motion for Protective Order; denying 30 Motion in Limine; denying 30 Motion to Strike Defense Witness. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/15/2013. (SMG)
November 29, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss filed by State Farm Insurance Company. Defts 12 Motion for Oral Argument is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/28/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Tamko Building Products Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamko Building Products Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Fernandez
Represented By: Cardenas Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?