Postell v. Lane et al

Plaintiff: Dwayne Postell
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Gerry Lane Buick-Pontiac-GMC, LLC, Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc and Gerald Lane
Case Number: 3:2012cv00527
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying part 72 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Postell's claim under La. R.S. § 23:631 is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Co urt dismiss Postell's federal and state law discrimination claims against Lane, or any other individual supervisor or fellow employee, is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Postell's claim that he was subjected to a h ostile work environment claim on the basis of his sex is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Postell's hostile work environment claim on the basis of his race is DENIED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Post ell's hostile work environment claim on the basis of his national origin is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Postell's retaliation claim is DENIED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Postell's bat tery claim is DENIED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Postell's assault claim is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Postell's intentional infliction of emotional distress claim is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/30/2014. (NLT)
September 10, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Plaintiff Brian Postell's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Postell's request that the Court preclude Defendants from asserting the Faragher/Ellerth defense in an attempt to avo id liability for Gerald R. Lane's acts is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants are PRECLUDED from asserting the Faragher/Ellerth defense in response to Postell's allegations regarding the acts of Gerald R. Lane. Postell's request that the Court preclude Defendants from asserting the Faragher/Ellerth defense in an attempt to avoid liability for the acts ofother employees is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/10/2014. (CGP)
September 25, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 43 Motion to Quash Subpoena, the defendants subpoena issued to At&T Mobility, LLC is quashed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/24/2013. (LLH)
August 28, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 15 Motion to Consolidate Cases, without prejudice to Postells right to refile the motion once discovery is complete and the Court has ruled on any impending dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/27/2013. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Postell v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Lane Buick-Pontiac-GMC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Postell
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?