Bell v. Lane et al

Plaintiff: Terry Bell
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Gerry Lane Buick-Pontiac-GMC, LLC, Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc and Gerald Lane
Case Number: 3:2012cv00529
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART (doc. 61) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Bell's federal and state law discrimination claims against Lane, or any other indiv idual supervisor or fellow employee, is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Bell's claim under La. R.S. § 23:631 is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Bell's claim that he was subj ected to a hostile work environment claim on the basis of his sex is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Bell's hostile work environment claim on the basis of his race is DENIED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Bell's hostile work environment claim on the basis of his national origin is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Bell's constructive discharge claim is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Bell's battery claim is DENIED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Bell's assault claim is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Bell's intentional infliction of emotional distress claim is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/30/2014. (PJH)
September 16, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/15/2014. (CGP)
August 28, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 16 Motion to Consolidate Cases, without prejudice to Bell's right to refile the motion once discovery is complete and the Court has ruled on any impending dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/27/2013. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Bell
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Lane Buick-Pontiac-GMC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?