Whitmore v. Butler et al

Plaintiff: Kenny Whitmore
Defendant: Robert Butler, Brian Meyers and Gail Smothers
Case Number: 3:2012cv00563
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 16 Motion for Relief of Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/10/2013. (SMG)
January 31, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiffs claims are dismissed pursuant to 28U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/31/2013. (PJH)
December 12, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING regarding 8 Motion of Inquiry. Insofar as the pltf sought information regarding the status of his pending civil rights suit, the motion is granted. A review of the record showed that a Magistrate Judges Report was issued 12/11/2012, recommending that the complaint be dismissed pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i).1 In all other respects, the pltfs motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/12/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitmore v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Smothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?