Hayes et al v. Frontera Produce, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Charles Lance Hayes, Jr. and Jude Thaddeus Hayes
Defendant: Primus Group, Inc. and Frontera Produce, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00588
Filed: September 21, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: Plaintiffs' 54 Motion for Leave to Amend is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' 55 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court shall create a new docket entry labeled "Additional Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration" for the exhibit currently located at Doc. 55-1. Plaintiffs' 62 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/17/2014. (SMG)
March 24, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED RULING AND ORDER granting 32 Primus's MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Clerk of Court shall STRIKE FROM THE RECORD 60 the original Order granting Primus's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/24/2014. (CGP)
November 20, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 11/20/2013. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes et al v. Frontera Produce, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lance Hayes, Jr.
Represented By: Norman Irion Lafargue
Represented By: William D Marler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jude Thaddeus Hayes
Represented By: Norman Irion Lafargue
Represented By: William D Marler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primus Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontera Produce, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?