Stewart v. Gautreaux, III et al

Plaintiff: Ashley Stewart
Defendant: Sheriff Sid J. Gautreaux, III and Captain Johnny Scott
Case Number: 3:2012cv00594
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: Plaintiff Ashley Stewart's 32 Motion for Reconsideration of 30 Ruling and Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge to conduct a STATUS CONFERENCE and re-set the parties� 39; deadlines, pretrial conference date, and trial dates. The 31 and 38 Motions for Summary Judgment are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The 39 and 41 Motions for Leave to File Reply Memoranda are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/12/2014. (SMG)
December 5, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration by District Court of Magistrate Ruling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/4/2013. (SMG)
June 26, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pltfs 16 Motion to Compel and for Additional Time to Amend is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 6/25/2013. (JDL)
May 21, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The deadline to file a motion for leave to amend the complaint, or add new parties, claims, counterclaims, or cross-claims is extended to 07/12/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 05/21/2013. (CGP) Modified on 5/22/2013 to edit the text to match the document (CGP). Modified on 5/23/2013 to edit document type (CGP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Gautreaux, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Represented By: Catherine S. St. Pierre
Represented By: Mary G. Erlingson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Johnny Scott
Represented By: Mary G. Erlingson
Represented By: Catherine S. St. Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Stewart
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Represented By: Blake S. Leger
Represented By: Marcus J. Plaisance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?