Felder's Collision Parts, Inc. v. General Motors Company et al

Plaintiff: Felder's Collision Parts, Inc.
Defendant: General Motors Company, All Star Advertising Agency Inc., All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C., All Star Chevrolet, Inc. and Joe Doe Defendants 1-25
Case Number: 3:2012cv00646
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Defendants' 54 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. All of the claims contained in the 50 Amended Complaint are DISMISSED. The 57 and 60 Motions for Leave as amicus curiae are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/23/2014. (SMG)
August 27, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 43 Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Documents and denying as moot 44 Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 08/27/2013. (CGP)
June 25, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 6/25/2013. (LLH)
April 17, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend (Doc. 25 at 22-23) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/16/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felder's Collision Parts, Inc. v. General Motors Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Star Advertising Agency Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Star Chevrolet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Doe Defendants 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felder's Collision Parts, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn E. Swanson
Represented By: Kevin M. McGlone
Represented By: Pan American Life Center
Represented By: Peter L. Hilbert, Jr.
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Darnell Bludworth
Represented By: Jones, Swanson, Huddell & Garrison
Represented By: Ryan D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?