Shank v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Christopher S. Shank
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy, Richard Peabody, Perry Dixon, Leslie Dupont, Five (5) Unknown Correctional Officers, Cathy Fontenot, Joesph Lamartiniere, James M. LeBlanc, N. Burl Cain, Cody Butler, Bo Whitaker and Troy Poret
Case Number: 3:2012cv00695
Filed: November 5, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 105 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that the Court decline the exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's state law claims, that the plaintiff's 91 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED, and that the defendants' 22 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, dismissing the plaintiff's claims, with prejudice, and that this action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/10/2014. (NLT)
August 20, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 88 Motion for an Order for Sanctions. The plaintiffs request for a continuance relative to the Courts consideration of the defendants pending Motion for Summary Judgment be and it is hereby GRANTED IN PART, such that the plaintiff shall file any opposition he may have to the defendants pending Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 9/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/20/2014. (SMG)
June 27, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/27/2014. (SMG)
September 26, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel and to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 09/26/2013. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shank v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Peabody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five (5) Unknown Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joesph Lamartiniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Poret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher S. Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?