Willis v. EAN Holdings,LLC et al

Plaintiff: Marsha A. Willis
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation, EAN Holdings,LLC, Elco Insurance Group, Inc. and Troy David Thibodeaux
Case Number: 3:2012cv00760
Filed: November 30, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration re 49 Order Remanding Case to State Court. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/10/2014. (LLH)
June 28, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Strike Insufficient Answer of EAN Holding, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 06/27/2013. (CGP)
June 10, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 1 Notice of Removal, filed by EAN Holdings,LLC Defendant EAN Holdings, LLC shall submit a brief, not later than 21 days after the date of this order, in support of their contention that this court has jurisdiction, specificall y addressing the alleged fraudulent joinder of defendant Thibodaux. Plaintiff shall then have 21 days from the submission of the defendants brief to file a response brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 6/10/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. EAN Holdings,LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings,LLC
Represented By: Anthony Jacob Culotta, Jr.
Represented By: David P. Salley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elco Insurance Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy David Thibodeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha A. Willis
Represented By: Marsha A. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?