Jackson v. Cain et al

Petitioner: Howard L. Jackson
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana and N. Burl Cain
Case Number: 3:2012cv00767
Filed: December 4, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER adopting 25 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Petitioner's 2254 Petition is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED because petitioner has failed to "make a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right." 28 USC 2253(c)(2). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/15/2014. (SMG)
September 19, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: The Court DECLINES TO ADOPT the 22 Magistrate Judge's Report and the recommendation made therein, and IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's § 2254 Petition is REFERRED BACK to the Magistrate Judge for further analysis. The Magistrate Judge shall issue a supplemental report addressing any additional procedural defects and/or the merits of Petitioner's application within 60 days. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/18/2014. (NLT)
January 7, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER 15 Adopting Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. The District Attorney for the Eighteenth Judicial District Court for the Parish o f West Baton Rouge, State of Louisiana :(1) supplement the record in this matter to address, if possible, the deficiencies noted in the Magistrate Judge's Report' and (2) file a supplemental memorandum addressing the merits of Petitioner's Petition,and any remaining issues in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 01/06/2014. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Howard L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?