Monroe v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Sean Monroe
Defendant: Jonathan Roundtree, N. Burl Cain and Kenneth Norris
Case Number: 3:2012cv00798
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 05/29/2014. (CGP)
May 15, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 35 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Cross-Summary Judgment is DENIED. Defendant, Dr. Jonathan Roundtree's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and this action shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 05/15/2014. (CGP)
May 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 19 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Defendant's 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's claims against Warden N. Burl Cain and Asst . Warden Kenneth Norris are dismissed, in all other respects the Motion to Dismiss is denied and this matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings on the Plaintiff's deliberate medical indifference claim against Dr. Jonathan Roundtree. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 05/29/2013. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?