Minnis v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Minnis
Defendant: Eddie Nunez, Joseph Alleva, Miriam Segar and Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Case Number: 3:2013cv00005
Filed: January 3, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. Minnis's claims against LSU are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. LSU's request that all costs be taxed against Minnis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/21/2014. (NLT)
December 4, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Compel. The portion of the motion as it pertains to Request for Production Nos. 6 and 7 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 12/4/2013. (SMG)
September 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and 21 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/17/2013. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minnis v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Minnis
Represented By: Amanda E. Love
Represented By: Crystal LaFleur
Represented By: Jill L. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Nunez
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Represented By: Amy L. McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Alleva
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Represented By: Amy L. McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam Segar
Represented By: Amy L. McInnis
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Represented By: Amy L. McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?