Black v. Morvant et al

Petitioner: Harold Joe Black
Respondent: Unknown Smart, Unknown Parro, WNC Morvant, WNC, Unknown Higginbotham, Unknown Carter and Unknown Caldwell
Case Number: 3:2013cv00019
Filed: January 9, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 19 Rule 60 (B) MOTION. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/21/2015. (LLH)
January 13, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: Petitioner Harold Joe Black's MOTION for Reconsider Denial of Petitioner Rule 60(b) Motion (doc. 22) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that this Court's Ruling and Order (doc. 20) is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall reinstate Petitioner's Rule 60(b) Motion (doc. 19) to the docket. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/13/2015. (JDL)
September 2, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER dismissing 19 Rule 60(b) Motion for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/02/2014. (CGP)
July 9, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 13 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/08/2014. (CGP)
December 4, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER. Ruling adopting 6 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge as the the Court's opinion herein. It is ORDERED that Petitioner's 2254 Petition 1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the reasons explained in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 6 . Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/04/2013. (CGP) Modified on 12/4/2013 to edit text (CGP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Morvant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown Parro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WNC Morvant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WNC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown Higginbotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold Joe Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?