Lambert et al v. Liberty Mutual

Plaintiff: Ladonna Lambert and Danny Lambert
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Notice Only: John W. Redmann
Case Number: 3:2013cv00023
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Compel Depositions and Production of Un-Redacted Documents. Under Rule 37(a)(5), the parties shall bear the respective costs incurred in connection with this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/22/2013. (JDL)
September 11, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: The 10 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED as the Court's opinion herein. The 7 Motion to Remand is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/10/2013. (NLT)
July 24, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 13 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 7/24/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambert et al v. Liberty Mutual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladonna Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: John W. Redmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver LLC - NO
Represented By: Bruce Warfield Hamilton
Represented By: Catherine Fornias Giarrusso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?