Reynolds v. Cain et al

Petitioner: Rhine Reynolds
Respondent: Burl Cain and James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00041
Filed: January 16, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 33 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 31 Motion for Relief from a Final Judgment shall be denied. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/11/2015. (BCL)
July 15, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The 38 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and 39 Motion for Certificate of Appealability are DENIED AS PREMATURE, without prejudice to re-filing when the Court enters a final appealable Ruling in connection with Petitioner's pending Motion for Relief from Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/15/2015. (LLH)
June 2, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting the 33 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 31 Motion for Relief from a Final Judgment is denied. In the event that the Petitioner seeks to pursue an appeal in this case, a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/2/2015. (LLH)
February 20, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL approving the 21 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and adopting as the Court's opinion herein. The Petitioner's {1] application for habeas corpus relief is denied as untimely pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d). Further, in the event that the Petitioner seeksto pursue an appeal in this case, a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 2/20/2014. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rhine Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?