Enclarde v. LA DOTD et al

Plaintiff: George R Enclarde
Defendant: Stephanie Ducote, Kathy Horsfall and LA DOTD
Case Number: 3:2013cv00056
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 26 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/11/2014. (JDL)
January 13, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 25 Motion to Compel Discovery. Plaintiff shall also pay to the defendants their reasonable expenses in the amount of $300, by 1/31/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/13/2014. (JDL)
August 26, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 18 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(5). The time for service is deemed extended through the actual date of service on the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 08/26/2013. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enclarde v. LA DOTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Ducote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Horsfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA DOTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George R Enclarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?