Jelks v. LA D.O.C. et al

Plaintiff: Phillip Jelks
Defendant: Burl Cain, Unknown Derecaux, Unknown Ganard, LA D.O.C., James Leblance, Unknown Smith, Unknown Webb and Unknown Will
Case Number: 3:2013cv00090
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned proceeding be DISMISSED, without prejudice, for failure of the plaintiff to prosecute this proceeding by failing to keep the Court apprised of a current address. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/1/2015. (BCL)
December 15, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: After independently reviewing the entire record in this case and for reasons set forth in the Magistrate Judge's 147 Report to which an objection was filed, the plaintiffs 134 Request for T.R.O. and an Injunction are denied. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 12/15/2014. (SMG)
June 6, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 116 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and granting 105 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 06/06/2014. (CGP)
December 12, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 83 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/12/2013. (CGP) Modified on 12/12/2013 to edit text(CGP).
June 3, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 20 MOTION to n Amend Complaint and ORDER for Service. Maj. Leonard Williams, Capt. Carl Smith, Capt. Grady Ganard, Capt. Lonzo Webb and Lt. Kenneth Derecaux are substituted for the defendants previously identified as Maj. Wi ll, Capt. Smith, Capt. Ganard, Capt. Webb and Lt.Derecaux. IT IS ORDERED that the defendants shall be served with a summons, the original Complaint, the Amended Complaint, and this Motion for Leave to File and Amend Complaint in accordance with law. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the defendants wherever found. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 6/3/2013. (LLH) names substituted as per order on 6/3/2013 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jelks v. LA D.O.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Derecaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ganard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Leblance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Jelks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?