Williams v. Sanders et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Williams
Defendant: Mason Hunter and John Sanders
Case Number: 3:2013cv00097
Filed: February 15, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: 55 MOTION in Limine to exclude Exhibits #5,6,8,9,10 & 11 filed by Sergeant Mason Hunter is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. 57 MOTION in Limine to limit Scope of Medical Records filed by Mason Hunter is DEFERRED until the morning of trial. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/7/2016. (JDL)
June 13, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 31 Motion to Strike and Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 6/13/2014. (SMG)
December 9, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: adopting 20 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge as the Court's opinion herein; denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Summary Judgment, dismissing a ny claim brought against Defendant in his official capacity, and DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiff's claim that Defendant Sgt. Mason Hunter interfered with his legal mail is DISMISSED as frivolous. This matter is referred back to t he magistrate judge for further proceedings on Plaintiff's excessive force claim. All claims against Defendant John Sanders are DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 4(m), for failure to timely serve the Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/09/2013. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?