Cedar Lodge Plantation, LLC et al v. CSHV Fairway View I, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Cedar Lodge Plantation, LLC and Phillips C Witter
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company, CSHV Fairway View I, LLC, CSHV Fairway View II, LLC, California State Teachers Retirement System, Campus Advantage, Inc., DEF Insurance Company, GHI Insurance Company, Heitman Capital Management, Sewer Treatment Specialists, LLC and UVW Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00129
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2017 270 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 184 Motion in Limine and granting in part and deferred in part 201 Motion to Amend Pretrial Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/31/2017. (KAH)
December 23, 2016 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Suresh Sharma and Ron Ferris. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/23/2016. (EDC)
December 21, 2016 219 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 120) filed by Sewer Treatment Specialists, LLC is GRANTED; Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert, Suresh Sharma (Doc. 142) filed by Sewer Treatment Specialists, LLS is DENI ED AS MOOT; Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert, Ron Ferris (Doc. 140) filed by Sewer Treatment Specialists, LLC is DENIED AS MOOT; Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 123) filed by Plaintiffs Cedar Lodge is DENIED; Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 120) filed by Defendant Fairway View is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; Fairway View's Motion to Strike the Declarations of Phillips Witter and Suresh Sharma (Doc. 142) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/21/2016. (PJH)
June 28, 2016 136 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 105 Motion to Strike Witnesses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 06/28/2016. (SGO)
May 8, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 05/08/2015. (NLT)
March 12, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER adopting 20 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and granting 9 Motion to Remand Case to 19th JDC filed by Phillips C Witter and Cedar Lodge Plantation, LLC. (Certified copy mailed to the appropriate judicial district court). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/11/2014. (CGP) Modified on 3/12/2014 to edit text(CGP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedar Lodge Plantation, LLC et al v. CSHV Fairway View I, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSHV Fairway View I, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. Force
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSHV Fairway View II, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. Force
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Teachers Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campus Advantage, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua S. Force
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heitman Capital Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sewer Treatment Specialists, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UVW Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Lodge Plantation, LLC
Represented By: Hunter Ryan Bertrand
Represented By: Dunlap Fiore, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillips C Witter
Represented By: Hunter Ryan Bertrand
Represented By: Dunlap Fiore, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?