Banks v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Matt Banks
Defendant: Unknown Lavespere, Jason Collion, N. Burl Cain and Trish Foster
Case Number: 3:2013cv00144
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING affirming and adopting 58 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The defendants' 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Collins and Dr. Levaspere are DISMISSED. The Plaintiff's claims against N. Burl Cain and Trish Foster are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim, based on the Plaintiff's failure to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 USC 1997e(a), and WITH PREJUDICE to refiling the complaint in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/21/2014. (SMG)
March 7, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 54 Motion to Recuse Magistrate Judge Under 28 USC Section 144 and 455 a(b)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/6/2014. (SMG)
October 25, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/24/2013. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lavespere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Collion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?