Berry v. Robertson et al

Plaintiff: Marcus Berry
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company and Leon Roberson
Case Number: 3:2013cv00145
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 78 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) and 79 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/26/2016. (LLH) Modified on 10/28/2016 to edit document type(LLH).
June 17, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 67 Motion for Relief from a Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60(B) and Alternatively a Declaratory Judgment filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/17/2016. (JDL)
April 28, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: The 47 Motion for New Trial, Or Alternatively Motion for Remittitur is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. Specifically, Defendants' motion for a new trial based on juror misconduct is DENIED, while their motion for remittitu r is GRANTED. The prior 44 Judgment is AMENDED, such that judgment is conditionally entered IN FAVOR OF Plaintiff Marcus Berry and AGAINST Defendants Leon Roberson and Auto-Owners Insurance Company in the sum of SEVEN HUNDRED NINETY THOUSAND ($ ;790,000.00) DOLLARS, with interest from the date of entry of final judgment, and costs. Plaintiff Berry shall file in the record within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Ruling and Order a written notice to the Court stating whether he acce pts or rejects the foregoing remittitur. If Plaintiff accepts the remittitur, final judgment in this matter, consistent with the findings herein, shall be rendered on the date of acceptance. If Plaintiff rejects the remittitur, the case of Plaintiff Marcus Berry versus Defendants Leon Roberson and Auto-Owners Insurance Company will be set for a new trial on the issue of general damages. Considering the Court's conditional judgment herein which alters the original judgment in this matter, Plaintiffs 48 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment to Add Interest is DENIED AS MOOT. Document 47-2 in this matter STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 04/28/2015. (BCL)
September 3, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED on the issue of Defendant Leon Roberson's liability for the collision. Plaintiff's motion is DENIED on the issue of causation. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/2/2014. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Robertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Represented By: Scott Michael Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas K. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Roberson
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Represented By: Scott Michael Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Berry
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Rabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?