Lillie et al v. Stanford Trust Company, et al
Plaintiff: Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E. Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Merrill LaPlante, Daniel P Landry, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, LARRY Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer and Sharon Witmer
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd., Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company, Stanford Trust Company and Office of Financial Institutions State of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2013cv00150
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RULING and ORDER denying 147 Motion for Reconsideration. Denying 153 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Documents in Support of Motion for Reconsideration because Plaintiffs have not demonstrated that the evidence contained in the supplem ental documents (1) is actually newly discovered; (2) could not have been discovered earlier by proper diligence; or (3) would create a genuine dispute as to SEI's ability to control the Stanford Trust Company's primary violations of the Lo uisiana Securities Law. Plaintiff's claims against the Insurer Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Because this Ruling and Order results in the denial of all relief, a final judgment shall follow in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/15/2019. (EDC)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RULING AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' 130 Motion for Dismissal of Summary Judgment or a Continuance is DENIED. SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company's 127 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' remaining cla ims against SEI Investment Company and SEI Private Trust Company are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiffs shall show cause, in writing and within 10 days, why the Court should not grant summary judgment in favor of the Insurer Defendants and there after enter final judgment in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. If Plaintiffs fail to timely respond, the Court will, on its own motion, enter summary judgment in the Insurer Defendants' favor. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/9/2019. (KAH)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RULING affirming and adopting 100 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 59 Motion to Remand should be granted and the Motion to Sever should be denied as moot. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/2/2013. (SMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lillie et al v. Stanford Trust Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: Judy Y. Barrasso
Represented By: Sarah Leslie Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Joseph Burns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Represented By: Robert Joseph Burns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: James L. Pate
Represented By: Robert E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd.
Represented By: Joshua S. Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Joseph Burns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutmeg Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel B. Centner
Represented By: Seth A. Schmeeckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI Investments Company
Represented By: Duris L. Holmes
Represented By: Robert E. Kerrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI Private Trust Company
Represented By: Duris L. Holmes
Represented By: Robert E. Kerrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Financial Institutions State of Louisiana
Represented By: Keary L. Everitt
Represented By: Marie Ganucheau Everitt
Represented By: David M. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamie Baumann
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence Beven, MD
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Bevis
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Bowden
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Boyd
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murphy Buell
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Burris
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Buscheme
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Buscheme
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bush
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Ellen Carter
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Causey
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde J Chisholm
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Chustz, Jr.
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Courville
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph D D'Amore
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dawson
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Demarest
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Doughtery
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcel Dumestre
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Dumestre
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Fabre
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Farr
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Feucht
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Feucht
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah S Forbes
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Forbes
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Giambrone
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gildersleeve
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willa Mae Gildersleeve
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon C Gill
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Gill
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hart
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Kirby
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Kling
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrill LaPlante
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P Landry
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Lee
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Lillie
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Magee
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Marquette
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R Marston
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie L Massey
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Anne Mayhall
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bille Ruth McMorris
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald McMorris
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia McMorris
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Mier
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Mier
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Millett
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Nix
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret S Nix
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny O'Rear
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia O'Rear
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Ordoyne
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Ordoyne
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Perkins
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty Perkins
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn J. Phillipe
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Phillips
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Roland
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Roland
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Sanchez
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamie Sanchez
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Savoy
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schwendimann
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Scrantz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Slaughter
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY Smith
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smith
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney P Starkey
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Stegall
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stegall
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Stone
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Tarver
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Tullis
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Valentine
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ventrella
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wade
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Sue Warnock
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Waxley
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles White
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wilkewitz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Wilson
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Jean Witmer
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Witmer
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?