Wiggins v. Cain et al
Petitioner: |
Lorenzo C. Wiggins |
Respondent: |
N. Burl Cain and James Caldwell |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00198 |
Filed: |
March 27, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Baton Rouge Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian A. Jackson |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen C. Riedlinger |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 18, 2015 |
Filing
41
RULING and ORDER: The Court APPROVES the Magistrate Judge's 31 Report and Recommendation and 39 Supplemental Report and Recommendation and ADOPTS them as the Court's opinion in this matter, in conjunction with the instant Ruling and Or der. The 1 Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED because Petitioner has failed to make "a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right." 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/18/2015. (BCL)
|
January 13, 2015 |
Filing
36
RULING AND ORDER granting 34 MOTION to Enforce This Court's Previous Order to the Clerk of Court for the 19th Judicial District Court. Within 14 days, the Clerk of Court for the Nineteenth Judicial District Court shall supplement the previous ly filed state court record by filing with this court copies of the two recorded statements played during the evidentiary hearing held on 11/12/2010. If the Clerk of Court is unable to produce either of the recorded statements, he shall advise this court in writing why he is unable to produce the recording.The 35 MOTION to Order Transcription of Recorded Tape Statements is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/13/2015. (LLH)
|
July 2, 2014 |
Filing
19
RULING and ORDER adopting 15 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and granting 14 MOTION to Dismiss All Grounds for Relief Which Were Not Fully Exhausted Through the State Courts when Original Habeas Corpus Petition was Filed filed by Lorenzo C. Wiggins. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/01/2014. (CGP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?